EP0540928 - Method for automatic redialling in communication terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/40] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH MERK-TELEFONBAU GMBH Rosenheimer Strasse 139 D-81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zibis, Ulf, Dipl.-Ing. Schildensteinstrasse 14 W-8000 München 80 / DE | [1993/19] | Application number, filing date | 92117829.9 | 19.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | DE19914135384 | 26.10.1991 Original published format: DE 4135384 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0540928 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0540928 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540928 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/274 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
H04M1/2749 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wahlwiederholung bei Kommunikations-Endgeräten | [1993/19] | English: | Method for automatic redialling in communication terminals | [1993/19] | French: | Procédé de recomposition automatique d'un numéro pour des terminaux de communication | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.02.1998 | IT | 18.02.1998 | NL | 18.02.1998 | AT | 19.10.1998 | BE | 31.10.1998 | CH | 31.10.1998 | LI | 31.10.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
AT | 19.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | IT | 18.02.1998 | |
AT | 19.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | IT | 18.02.1998 | |
AT | 19.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | IT | 18.02.1998 | |
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 18.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US966005T (GILLETTE) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3410633 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 19; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4736410 (NISHIDA KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 57; figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 2, line 13 - line 37 *; | [A]US4930155 (KUROKAWA SHUNJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 42; figure 2; claims 1,3-5 * * column 2, line 15 - line 28 * |