EP0546291 - Electrochemical measuring cell for the determination of ammonia or hydrazine in a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft 23542 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft D-23542 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiesele, Herbert, Dr. Julius-Milde-Weg 8 W-2400 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Kühn, Uwe Mühlenkamp 9 W-2067 Wesenberg / DE | 03 /
Haupt, Stephan, Dr. Dr. Julius-Leber-Strasse 51 W-2400 Lübeck / DE | [1993/24] | Application number, filing date | 92118137.6 | 23.10.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910804722 | 11.12.1991 Original published format: US 804722 | DE19924227946 | 22.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4227946 | [1993/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546291 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/49, G01N33/00 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
G01N27/4045 (EP);
G01N33/0054 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/24] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Messzelle zur Bestimmung von Ammoniak oder Hydrazin in einer Messprobe | [1993/24] | English: | Electrochemical measuring cell for the determination of ammonia or hydrazine in a sample | [1993/24] | French: | Cellule de mesure électrochimique pour la détermination de l'ammoniaque ou de l'hydrazine dans un échantillon | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0395927 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]); | [YP]EP0496527 (CITY TECH [GB]); | [A]US4183791 (HUBER CALVIN O [US], et al) |