EP0540964 - Knife holder for circular knife on paper processing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.C.H. Will GmbH Postfach 54 03 20 D-22503 Hamburg / DE | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kröger, Holger Falkenbergstrasse 181 W-2000 Norderstedt / DE | 02 /
Stolley, Dieter Lütchenmoor 56 W-2000 Norderstedt / DE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Hiss, Ludwig, et al c/o Körber AG, Patentabteilung 21027 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Hiss, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Körber AG, Patentabteilung D-21027 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118236.6 | 24.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | DE19914136506 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4136506 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540964 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/04 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
B26D5/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7751 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7818 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7843 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7847 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Messerhalter für Längsschnittstationen an Papierverarbeitungsmaschinen | [1993/19] | English: | Knife holder for circular knife on paper processing machines | [1993/19] | French: | Support pour couteau circulaire pour machines de traitement du papier | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/45] | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3810675 (MEISAN KK [JP]); | [YD]DE2821957 ; | [Y]GB1142814 (SIEGFRIED HAENCHEN) |