Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] |
14.12.1994 | First examination report | |
06.11.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] |
26.03.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] |
26.03.1993 | Change - applicant | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |