Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05228889 | Global Dossier | 07.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4136506 | 06.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0540964 | Global Dossier | 12.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4136506 | 06.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4136506 | 13.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4136506 | 06.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI925017 | 07.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4136506 | 06.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5247865 | 28.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4136506 | 06.11.1991 |