EP0559960 - Shaped charge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 11 09 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft D-81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states Deutsche Aerospace AG Postfach 80 11 09 D-81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states Deutsche Aerospace AG D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassfurther, Rainer Berliner Strasse 24 W-8898 Schrobenhausen / DE | 02 /
Hübner, Wilhelm, Ing. Hohenwarter Strasse 39 W-8899 Hohenwart / DE | [1993/37] | Application number, filing date | 92118476.8 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | DE19924207828 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4207828 | [1993/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559960 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559960 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/08 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
F41B9/0046 (EP);
F42B3/08 (EP);
F42B33/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Hohlladung | [1993/37] | English: | Shaped charge | [1993/37] | French: | Charge creuse | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.03.1995 | ES | 29.03.1995 | GB | 29.03.1995 | IT | 29.03.1995 | SE | 29.06.1995 | AT | 29.10.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 29.03.1995 | |
ES | 29.03.1995 | ||
GB | 29.03.1995 | ||
IT | 29.03.1995 | ||
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
AT | 29.10.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 29.03.1995 | |
GB | 29.03.1995 | ||
IT | 29.03.1995 | ||
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
AT | 29.10.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | BE | 29.03.1995 | |
GB | 29.03.1995 | ||
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
AT | 29.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 29.03.1995 | |
GB | 29.03.1995 | ||
SE | 29.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3188955 (BROWN WILLIAM E); | [A]US3759182 (LEVAMAKI R, et al); | [A]US3960082 (SLOEVSKY FEDOR IGNATIEVICH, et al); | [A]US4259906 (KRAUCH JR ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US4372213 (ROZNER ALEXANDER G, et al); | [A]DE3631249 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]US4905601 (GABRIEL ROY E [CA], et al); | [AD]US4955939 (PETROUSKY JAMES A [US], et al) |