EP0581998 - Grip scissors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clover Mfg. Co., Ltd. 15-5, Nakamichi 3-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 537-0025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states CLOVER MFG. CO., LTD. 15-5, Nakamichi 3-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Hidekazu 15-5, Nakamichi 3-chome Higashinari-ku, Osaka / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118511.2 | 29.10.1992 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920055740U | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 5574092 U | JP19920055741U | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 5574192 U | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581998 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581998 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B26B13/18 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
B26B13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/06] | Title | German: | Schere | [1994/06] | English: | Grip scissors | [1994/06] | French: | Ciseaux | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3972333 (LEVEEN HARRY H) [A] 1* column W *; | [XA]EP0002515 (COOPER IND INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [DA]JPS63189172U (...) [DA] 1-7 * figure - * |