EP0542054 - Reading apparatus for eyesight handicapped person [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoda, Isamu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118520.3 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | JP19910284745 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28474591 | JP19910310661 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31066191 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0542054 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0542054 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542054 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09B21/00, A61F9/08 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G09B21/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/20] | Title | German: | Lesevorrichtung für eine sehbehinderte Person | [1993/20] | English: | Reading apparatus for eyesight handicapped person | [1993/20] | French: | Dispositif de lecture pour une personne malvoyante | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 24.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.02.1999 | GB | 29.10.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/09] | FR | 23.07.1999 | |
GB | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 23.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0236631 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]DE3901023 (RITTER ULRICH DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]EP0249920 (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT], et al); | [A]GB2141274 (PATHWAY COMMUNICATIONS LTD) | [Y] - SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN vol. 21, no. 7, July 1990, NEW YORK US pages 75 - 85 YOSHIHIRO KAWAI ET AL. 'A Support System for the Blind to recognize a diagram' | [A] - TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU vol. 83, no. 31, August 1991, BERN CH pages 48 - 51 URS M]LLER ET AL. 'Interaktive Lesehilfe für Blinde. Mit dem Finger lesen' |