EP0596151 - Mattress cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuhangel, Gerhard Heinrich 702 Twin Towers North, Beach Road Sea Point 8001 / ZA | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Weber, Otto-Ernst, et al Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys., et al Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118824.9 | 03.11.1992 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596151 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596151 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/02, A47C21/06 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A47C31/105 (EP,US);
A47G9/0246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/19] | Title | German: | Bettbezug | [1994/19] | English: | Mattress cover | [1994/19] | French: | Drap-housse | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 21.09.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3636575 (SMITH IMRE JACK); | [X]US5007123 (SALYARDS DONALD M [US]); | [A]DE7247067U ; | [A]DE8700571U ; | [A]GB1168565 (BLINSTON & O GRADY LTD) |