EP0550812 - Precision automatic scrolling for an image display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Jerry Richard 95 McKinstry Road Gardiner, New York 12525 / US | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/28] | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 77 D-71155 Altdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118886.8 | 04.11.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | US19910810465 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: US 810465 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550812 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/28] | Title | German: | Automatische Feinverschiebung für ein Bildanzeigesystem | [1993/28] | English: | Precision automatic scrolling for an image display system | [1993/28] | French: | Décolage automatique avec précision pour un système d'affichage d'image | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/31] | 14.03.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02183294 ; | [A]WO9117512 (ASHLAR INC [US]) | [A] - APPLE COMPUTER, INC. 'Inside Macintosh - Volumes I, II, and III' October 1991 , ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, INC. Par. 'Automatic Scrolling' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 462 (P-1113)5 October 1990 & JP-A-02 183 294 ( FUJI XEROX CO LTD ) 17 July 1990, & JP02183294 A 19900717 |