EP0548515 - Bearing assembly for the saw blade holder of sawing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO ELEKTROWERKZEUGE GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 10 71364 Winnenden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO ELEKTROWERKZEUGE GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 10 D-71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Held, Hans Hohenneuffenweg 7 W-7151 Allmersbach im Tal / DE | 02 /
Hörner, Gerhard Am Husarenbaum 25 W-7518 Bretten / DE | 03 /
Langhoff, Boris Im Blütengarten 1 W-7150 Backnang / DE | 04 /
Marek, Gerhard Bergstrasse 26 W-7157 Murrhardt / DE | 05 /
Piater, Herbert Eichwiesenstrasse 14 W-7157 Murrhardt / DE | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Gaiser, Hartmut Sulzbacher Strasse 39 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Gaiser, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Sulzbacher Strasse 39 D-90489 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118922.1 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | DE19914139130 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4139130 | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548515 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548515 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23D51/02, B23D49/16 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
B23D49/165 (EP);
B23D51/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Lagereinrichtung für den Stössel einer Sägemaschine | [1993/26] | English: | Bearing assembly for the saw blade holder of sawing machine | [1993/26] | French: | Agencement de support pour le poussoir d'une lame de scie dans une machine à scier | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.04.1995 | NL | 19.04.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 19.04.1995 | |
FR | 15.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 15.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8633351U ; | [Y]DE3203733 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL [DE]); | [A]FR587291 ; | [A]US3269197 (ENDERS SHERWOOD G); | [A]DE3222120 (AEG POWER TOOL CORP APTC [US]) |