blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0541100

EP0541100 - A toner supply device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.05.1997 [1997/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.
2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/19]For all designated states
MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.
2-18, Tamatsukuri 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Marumoto, Takeshi
178, Kamayashikicho
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
[1993/19]
Representative(s)Rutetzki, Andreas
Müller-Boré & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/19]Rutetzki, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2
D-81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date92118992.405.11.1992
[1993/19]
Priority number, dateJP1991028848305.11.1991         Original published format: JP 28848391
[1993/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0541100
Date:12.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0541100
Date:20.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0541100
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.1994
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/08
[1993/19]
CPC:
G03G15/0822 (EP,US); G03G15/0867 (EP,US); G03G15/0877 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/19]
TitleGerman:Tonerzufuhrgerät[1993/19]
English:A toner supply device[1993/19]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de toner[1993/19]
Examination procedure21.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/47]
23.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.1996Fee for grant paid
14.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5893080  ;
 [A]JPS60250374  ;
 [A]WO8908284  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830826), vol. 7, no. 196, Database accession no. (P - 219)<1341>, & JP58093080 A 19830602 (RICOH) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860509), vol. 10, no. 124, Database accession no. (P - 454)<2181>, & JP60250374 A 19851211 (FUJI) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - H. AMMENHEUSER ET AL, "Toner Primer for Remote Toner Sump", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, (198504), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 81 - 82 [A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.