EP0541104 - Silver halide photographic emulsion and light-sensitive silver halide photographic material making use of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Tomoyuki, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118996.5 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | JP19910317268 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31726891 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541104 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/09 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
G03C1/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Photographische Silberhalogenidemulsion und diese enthaltendes photographisches lichtempfindliches Material | [1993/19] | English: | Silver halide photographic emulsion and light-sensitive silver halide photographic material making use of the same | [1993/19] | French: | Emulsion photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et matériau photographique sensible à la lumière contenant celle-ci | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/28] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0122125 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [YD]EP0302528 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US4906558 (MUECKE BRUNO [DE], et al); | [X]EP0294149 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]GB2113415 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [YD]JPH1158425 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013no. 426 (P-935)22 September 1989 & JP-A-11 58 425 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD. ) 21 June 1989 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE vol. 32, no. 1, February 1988SPRINGFIELD US pages 20 - 27 H TAKIGUCHI 'Effects of tetraazaindene on reaction and aggregation processes in sulfur sensitization with thiosulfate' | [Y] - PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING vol. 25, no. 2, April 1981WASHINGTON US pages 57 - 62 D A PITT ET AL 'Model for the chemical sensitization of silver halide photographic emulsions with sulfur and gold' |