EP0546327 - Accessory for laparoscopic operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaller, Günter, Dr. med. Am Lusbühl 32A 79110 Freiburg / DE | [1995/11] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states WILLY RÜSCH AG Postfach 11 80 D-71385 Kernen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaller, Günter Am Lusbühl 32 a W-7800 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Klietsch, Dietmar Gänsäckerstrasse 48 W-7050 Waiblingen / DE | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119092.2 | 07.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | DE19914140156 | 05.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140156 | [1993/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546327 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546327 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B19/10 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B46/23 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/24] | Title | German: | Hilfsmittel für laparoskopische Operationen | [1993/24] | English: | Accessory for laparoscopic operations | [1993/24] | French: | Accessoire pour opérations laparoscopiques | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.05.1995 | GB | 17.05.1995 | IT | 17.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 17.05.1995 | |
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | GB | 17.05.1995 | |
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | GB | 17.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3413375 (MOELNLYCKE GMBH [DE]); | [YD]US5037379 (CLAYMAN RALPH V [US], et al); | [A]GB2199498 (GARTH JESSAMINE JOHN, et al); | [A]US3736934 (HENNESSY A); | [A]US4953566 (GARREN LLOYD R [US]); | [A]US3286713 (KURTZ LEONARD D, et al) |