EP0546349 - PRP overproducing haemophilus influenzae strain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY One Cyanamid Plaza Wayne, NJ 07470-8426 / US | [1994/28] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finn, Charles William, Jr. 1 Johnson Road Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119535.0 | 16.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910803866 | 09.12.1991 Original published format: US 803866 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546349 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546349 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/74, C12N1/21, C12N15/65, C12P19/04, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:21) | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N1/20 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12N15/65 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | PRP überproduzierender Haemophilus-Influenza-Stamm | [1993/24] | English: | PRP overproducing haemophilus influenzae strain | [1993/24] | French: | Souche d'Haemophilus influenzae sur produisant PRP | [1993/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 05.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007690 (TATE & LYLE PATENT HOLDINGS [BM], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 11 - line 22 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 8 *; | [A]EP0101562 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 6 *; | [A]US4894331 (RATZKIN BARRY J [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 25; example 1 * |