EP0543308 - Aqueous polyesters, easily bondable polyester films formed by coating said aqueous polyesters, and process for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Akihiro 1565 Montebello Oaks Ct Los Altos California 94024 / US | 02 /
Miura, Sadayoshi 3316-6, Fukuda Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ichihashi, Tetsuo 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | [1993/23] |
Former [1993/21] | 01 /
Nishimura, Akihiro 6-1-3, Mikageyamate, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Miura, Sadayoshi 3316-6, Fukuda Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ichihashi, Tetsuo 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Kraus, Walter, Dr. Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119555.8 | 16.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | JP19910328308 | 18.11.1991 Original published format: JP 32830891 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0543308 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0543308 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543308 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/18, C08G63/60, C08G63/688, C08J7/04, C08J5/18 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
C08G63/185 (EP,US);
C08G63/18 (KR);
C08G63/60 (KR);
C08G63/688 (KR);
C08G63/6884 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C09D167/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/21] | Title | German: | Wässrige Polyester; leicht haftende Filme, die durch Beschichten dieser wässrigen Polyester hergestellt werden; und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/05] | English: | Aqueous polyesters, easily bondable polyester films formed by coating said aqueous polyesters, and process for producing same | [1993/21] | French: | Polyesters aqueux, films à haute adhérence obtenus par revêtement desdits polyesters aqueux, et procédé pour les obtenir | [1993/21] |
Former [1993/21] | Wässrige Polyester; leicht haftende Filme, die durch Beschichten dieser wässrigen Polyestern hergestellt werden; und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP3164251 ; | [A]KR9005396 ; | [A]DE1915319 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | [X]US3666698 (HARRIS ROBERT R, et al); | [A]US4252921 (MERRILL STEWART H, et al); | [X]EP0081925 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [Y]US4476189 (POSEY ROBERT G [US], et al) | [Y] - WPIL, AN=91-250051 (34), Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-3 164 251 (TORAY IND.) 16-07-1991, & JP3164251 A 00000000 | [A] - WPIL, AN=91-243711 (33), Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & KR-A-9 005 396 (KOREA CHEM. CO.) 28-07-1990, & KR9005396 A 00000000 |