EP0547387 - Membrane air drying and separation operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1995/01] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prasad, Ravi 12 Yardly Lane East Amherst 14051 / US | 02 /
Notaro, Frank 18 Harcroft Court Amherst 14226 / US | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119627.5 | 17.11.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910794911 | 20.11.1991 Original published format: US 794911 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547387 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547387 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/226 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1996/40] |
Former [1993/25] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Membran Lufttrocknungs- und Trennungsverfahren | [1993/25] | English: | Membrane air drying and separation operations | [1993/25] | French: | Procédés utilisant des membranes pour sécher et séparer l'air | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0430304 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0397204 (UNION CARBIDE IND GASES TECH [US]) | Examination | US4783201 |