EP0549885 - Plasticizable admixtures and improved cordierite substrates made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Locker, Robert John, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | [1996/05] |
Former [1993/27] | 01 /
Locker, Robert John, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, New York 14831 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/27] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120048.1 | 25.11.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | US19920816240 | 03.01.1992 Original published format: US 816240 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549885 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549885 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/18, C04B38/00 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B35/14 (KR);
B01D53/86 (KR);
B01J35/56 (KR);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (KR);
C04B2111/00129 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Plastifizierbare Mischungen und daraus hergestellte verbesserte Cordieritsubstrate | [1993/27] | English: | Plasticizable admixtures and improved cordierite substrates made therefrom | [1993/27] | French: | Mélanges à plastifier et substrats améliorés en cordierite fabriqué à partir de ces mélanges | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/07] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE Porzellanwerk Kloster Veilsdorf GmbH Fabrikstr. 1 98669 Veilsdorf / DE Opponent's representative Däsch, Götz Patentanwalt Engelplatz 11 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE Porzellanwerk Kloster Veilsdorf GmbH Fabrikstr. 1 98669 Veilsdorf / DE Opponent's representative Däsch, Götz Patentanwalt Engelplatz 11 07743 Jena / DE | 12.12.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.04.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.06.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.11.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.11.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2249856 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [YD]FR2272965 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]EP0227482 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0232621 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0514205 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) |