EP0601217 - Oscillator circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAGENUK GmbH Westring 431 24118 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states HAGENUK GMBH Westring 431 D-24118 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiesenthal, Hartmut Eckenförderstrasse 85a W-2307 Schwedeneck 1 / DE | 02 /
Behrent, Hermann W-2071 Kuddewörde / DE | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120165.3 | 26.11.1992 | [1994/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601217 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601217 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03B25/00, H03B5/36 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
H03B5/36 (EP);
H03B25/00 (EP);
H03B2200/0094 (EP);
H03B5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | Oszillatorschaltung | [1994/24] | English: | Oscillator circuit | [1994/24] | French: | Circuit oscillateur | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.07.1995 | MC | 26.07.1995 | AT | 26.11.1995 | ES | 27.11.1995 | BE | 30.11.1995 | CH | 30.11.1995 | LI | 30.11.1995 | LU | 30.11.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [2003/18] | GR | 26.07.1995 | |
MC | 26.07.1995 | ||
AT | 26.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 26.07.1995 | |
AT | 26.11.1995 | ||
MC | 26.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | GR | 26.07.1995 | |
MC | 26.07.1995 | ||
AT | 26.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 26.07.1995 | |
AT | 26.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 26.11.1995 | |
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 26.11.1995 | |
BE | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 30.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4859969 (MALINOWSKI GREGORY J [US], et al); | [A]EP0400425 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD] - SCHODOWSKI S. S., "RESONATOR SELF-TEMPERATURE-SENSING USING A DUAL-HARMONIC-MODE CRYSTAL OSCILLATOR.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL FREQUENCY CONTROL SYMPOSIUM. DENVER, MAY 31 - JUNE 2, 1989., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19890531), vol. SYMP. 43, pages 02 - 07., XP000089394 |