EP0545322 - Bicycle front derailleur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAEDA INDUSTRIES, LTD. 97, Tannan Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states MAEDA INDUSTRIES, LTD. 97, Tannan Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Jun, c/o Maeda Industries, Ltd. 97 Tannan, Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun, Osaka / JP | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120330.3 | 27.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | JP19910098775 | 29.11.1991 Original published format: JP 9877591 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545322 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/12 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B62M9/136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Fahrradgangschaltung für Vorderrad | [1993/23] | English: | Bicycle front derailleur | [1993/23] | French: | Dérailleur avant pour bicyclette | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/31] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3411874 ; | [A]US4223562 |