EP0546407 - Use of organo-functional polysiloxanes for modifying the surfaces of fine particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 D-45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höhner, Werner Finkenstrasse 34 W-5620 Velbert 11 / DE | 02 /
Schaefer, Dietmar, Dr. Im Poth 12 W-4320 Hattingen / DE | [1993/24] | Application number, filing date | 92120402.0 | 28.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | DE19914140794 | 11.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140794 | [1993/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546407 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546407 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546407 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/12, C03C25/02 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
C03C25/40 (EP,US);
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/24] | C09C3/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/24] | Title | German: | Verwendung von organofunktionellen Polysiloxanen zum Modifizierten der Oberfläche feinteiliger Partikel | [1993/24] | English: | Use of organo-functional polysiloxanes for modifying the surfaces of fine particles | [1993/24] | French: | Utilisation de polysiloxanes organofonctionnels pour modifier les surfaces de fines particules | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0373426 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [PA]EP0462389 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) |