EP0545353 - Aqueous resin dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO. LTD. 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koji, Kamikado 2057, Kosugaya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120478.0 | 01.12.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | JP19910348372 | 05.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34837291 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545353 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545353 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/22, C08G59/38, C08G18/28, C09D175/04 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G59/226 (EP,US);
C08G59/28 (EP,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2845 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/2845 (US,EP);
C09D175/04, C08L63/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/23] | Title | German: | Wässrige Harzdispersionen | [1993/23] | English: | Aqueous resin dispersions | [1993/23] | French: | Dispersions de résine aqueuses | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0175474 (MACPHERSON FINISH LTD [GB]); | [A]US4804710 (NAKATA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0350232 (SOMAR CORP [JP]) | Examination | US3922253 |