EP0547426 - Dispenser pack for the successive dispensing of a drug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D. Searle & Co. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states G.D. SEARLE & CO. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honan, David G. 31 Quincy Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | 02 /
Lantz, Gregory W. 1036 East Jefferson Avenue Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | 03 /
Salisbury, Thomas 58 Pequot Wayland, Massachusetts 01778 / US | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120499.6 | 01.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910810233 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: US 810233 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547426 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547426 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/00, B65D83/04 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
B65D83/0463 (EP,US);
A61J1/035 (EP,US);
A61J7/0076 (EP,US);
B65D2583/0409 (EP,US);
B65D2583/0472 (EP,US);
Y02W30/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | Spender zur einzelportionierten Ausgabe von Arzneimittel | [1993/25] | English: | Dispenser pack for the successive dispensing of a drug | [1993/25] | French: | Boîte distributrice pour distribution successive d'un médicament | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.07.1997 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3904075 (RICHARDSON JAMES E, et al); | [AD]EP0191168 (SIMON UDO); | [AD]US4905866 (BARTELL RALPH [US], et al); | [A]US5019125 (REBNE THOMAS M [US], et al) |