EP0545385 - Control method and system of servo hydraulic pressure in automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/23] | Control method of servo hydraulic pressure in automatic transmission | ||
[1996/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Masahiko 11-1, Morishita-aza, Nishiotomo-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Noda, Koji 94-4, Ikeura, Ikeura-cho, Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yoshihisa 64-1, Nakaawara, Kumami-cho, Nishio-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Hayabuchi, Masahiro 7-2, 2-Chome, Oyama-cho, Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Tsukamoto, Kazumasa 3-83, Mitachi-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Hojo, Yasuo 2-11-1, Katasaka-cho, Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Kubo, Seitoku 4-5-20, Sakae-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 08 /
Taga, Yutaka 2-7-10, Shiratori, Togo-cho, Aichi-gun Aich-ken / JP | 09 /
Oba, Hidehiro 34-1, Higashiharayama No. 102 Nagakute, Nagakute-cho, Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120572.0 | 02.12.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | JP19910344124 | 03.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34412491 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545385 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545385 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
F16H61/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines servohydraulischen Drucks in einem Automatikgetriebe | [1996/30] | English: | Control method and system of servo hydraulic pressure in automatic transmission | [1996/30] | French: | Procédé et dispostif de commande d'une pression servo-hydraulique dans une transmission automatique | [1996/30] |
Former [1993/23] | Steuerungsverfahren eines servohydraulischen Druckes in einem Automatikgetriebe | ||
Former [1993/23] | Control method of servo hydraulic pressure in automatic transmission | ||
Former [1993/23] | Procédé de commande d'une pression servo-hydraulique dans une transmission automatique | Examination procedure | 18.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2938268 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]DE3140259 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]); | [A]US4724723 (LOCKHART BRUCE D [US], et al); | [A]EP0411558 (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]); | [X]US5046176 (LIN WILLIAM C [US]) |