EP0545405 - Rotary detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koh, Ishizuka, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Tetsuharu, Nishimura, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120639.7 | 03.12.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | JP19910348069 | 04.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34806991 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0545405 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0545405 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545405 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/38 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G01D5/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Rotationsdetektor | [1993/23] | English: | Rotary detector | [1993/23] | French: | Détecteur de rotation | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0426125 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0365806 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]EP0397202 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4967072 (NISHIMURA TETSUHARU [JP]) |