EP0546452 - Coating process using dense phase gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace, P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles California 90080-0028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace, P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, California 90080-0028 / US | ||
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, David P. 22328 Barcotta Drive Saugus, California 91350 / US | 02 /
Buck, Orval F. 2435 25th Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120667.8 | 03.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910805753 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: US 805753 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546452 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546452 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/18 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B05D1/18 (EP,US);
C23C18/00 (KR);
B05D2401/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/24] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsverfahren unter Verwendung von dichten Gasphasen | [1993/24] | English: | Coating process using dense phase gas | [1993/24] | French: | Procédé de revêtement utilisant un fluide gazeux dense | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.04.1998 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP4222662 ; | US4737984 [ ] (BROWN ANTHONY K D [CA]); | EP0453107 [ ] (UNIV COLORADO FOUNDATION [US]); | DE2853066 [ ] (WINSEL AUGUST PROF DIPL PHYS D) | [AP] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 39, 1992 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A11, AN 92-319286 & JP-A-4 222 662 (NIPPON STEEL CHEM CO.) 12 August 1992, & JP4222662 A 19920812 | Examination | US4737384 |