EP0546507 - FIFO memory control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushita, Tsukasa, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | 02 /
Shimatani, Akira, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/24] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120923.5 | 08.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | JP19910324764 | 09.12.1991 Original published format: JP 32476491 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546507 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546507 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/06 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
G06F5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/24] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Steuerung eines FIFO-Speichers | [1993/24] | English: | FIFO memory control device | [1993/24] | French: | Dispositif de commande de mémoire FIFO | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/39] | 24.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57040800 ; | [Y]EP0341887 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]US4037203 (STALLEY ANTHONY DONALD); | [A]EP0299264 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 112 (P-124)23 June 1982 & JP-A-57 040 800 ( MITSUBISHI ), & JP57040800 A 19820623 |