EP0546521 - Image fixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/24] | Dye fixing element | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aono, Toshiaki c/o Fuji photo Film Co.,Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120994.6 | 09.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | JP19910349734 | 10.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34973491 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546521 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546521 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C8/52, G03C8/56, G03C8/40 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
G03C8/52 (EP,US);
G03C8/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/24] | Title | German: | Bildfixiersystem | [1998/37] | English: | Image fixing system | [1998/37] | French: | Système fixateur d'image | [1998/37] |
Former [1993/24] | Farbstoff-Fixierelement | ||
Former [1993/24] | Dye fixing element | ||
Former [1993/24] | Elément fixateur de colorant | Examination procedure | 06.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.06.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/25] | FR | 29.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3239338 (ROGERS HOWARD G); | [X]US3295970 (ROGERS HOWARD G); | [Y]EP0426087 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |