EP0546535 - Roller body for paint roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIA FARBWERKZEUG GmbH & CO. KG Peter-Dörfler-Strasse 32 D-88239 Wangen / DE | [1993/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Helmut Alpenstrasse 37 W-7989 Amtzell / DE | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/24] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121035.7 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | DE19914140813 | 11.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140813 | [1993/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546535 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/02 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B05C17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Walzenkörper für einen Farbroller | [1993/24] | English: | Roller body for paint roller | [1993/24] | French: | Corps de rouleau pour rouleau à peinture | [1993/24] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3714415 |