07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
13.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
05.12.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
27.03.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] |
07.02.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
31.01.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
16.02.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
13.04.1995 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
17.06.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |
03.12.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] |
14.05.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |