Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0548731 | Global Dossier | 03.04.1996 | B1 | EP0548731 | 26.01.1994 | A3 | EP0548731 | 30.06.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4142970 | 24.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE136398T | 15.04.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4142970 | 24.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4142970 | 01.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4142970 | 24.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59205906D1 | 09.05.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4142970 | 24.12.1991 |