blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0548790

EP0548790 - (1'S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxylic acids and their use as beta-lactamase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/26](1S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxylic acids and their use as beta-lactamase inhibitors
[1996/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.1997
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.1997 [1997/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/06]For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US
Former [1993/26]For all designated states
Pfaendler, Hans Rudolf, Prof. Dr.
Pippinplatz 1
D-81475 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pfaendler, Hans Rudolf, Prof. Dr.
Pippinplatz 1
81475 München / DE
[1996/17]
Former [1993/26]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/06]Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date92121455.717.12.1992
[1993/26]
Priority number, dateDE1991414242320.12.1991         Original published format: DE 4142423
[1993/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0548790
Date:30.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0548790
Date:01.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:C07D498/04, A61K31/42
[1993/26]
CPC:
C07D503/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1993/26]
TitleGerman:(1'S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carbonsäuren und ihre Verwendung als Betalactamasehemmer[1996/18]
English:(1'S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxylic acids and their use as beta-lactamase inhibitors[1996/18]
French:Acides (1'S)-hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxyliques et leur utilisation comme inhibiteurs de la bêta-lactamase[1996/18]
Former [1993/26](1S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carbonsäuren und ihre Verwendung als Betalactamasehemmer
Former [1993/26](1S)-Hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxylic acids and their use as beta-lactamase inhibitors
Former [1993/26]Acides (1S)-hydroxyalkyloxapenem-3-carboxyliques et leur utilisation comme inhibiteurs de la bêta-lactamase
Examination procedure08.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/05]
13.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
24.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
26.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.10.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.1996Fee for grant paid
08.01.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199504   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0301394  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [AD]EP0362622  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [AP]EP0474038  (BAYER AG [DE])
 [AD]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 9, 4. März 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 81343m, M. MURAKAMI ET AL.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.