Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
09.02.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] |
05.01.1996 | Renewal fee | |
28.08.1995 | First examination report | |
21.06.1994 | Change - representative | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
23.04.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
22.09.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
16.07.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] |