Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0557610 | Global Dossier | 27.03.1996 | B1 | EP0557610 | 10.11.1993 | A3 | EP0557610 | 01.09.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4204530 | 15.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4204530 | 19.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4204530 | 15.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59205860D1 | 02.05.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4204530 | 15.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5427419 | 27.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4204530 | 15.02.1992 |