EP0548839 - Flame retarded methyl methacrylates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bromine Compounds Ltd. Makleff House P.O.B. 180 Beer-Sheva 84101 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states Bromine Compounds Ltd. Makleff House P.O.B. 180 Beer-Sheva 84101 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daren, Stephen 10 Hapartizanim Street Ness Ziona 70400 / IL | 02 /
Peled, Michael 17 Hazav Street Beer-Sheva / IL | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92121584.4 | 18.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | IL19400001005 | 27.12.1991 Original published format: IL 100540 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548839 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/14 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C08F220/14 (EP);
C08F220/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Flammwidrige Methyl-Methacrylate | [1993/26] | English: | Flame retarded methyl methacrylates | [1993/26] | French: | Méthylméthacrylates à combustion retardée | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/42] | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1026912 (ICI LTD); | [X]FR2316254 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [X]EP0013052 (STAMICARBON [NL]) |