EP0548841 - Magnetoresistance effect element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to 103 / JP | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | For:DE
FR
GB
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For:GB
FR
DE
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | |||
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For:DE
FR
GB
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinjo, Teruya 39-1055, Ogurayama, Kohata Uji-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hidefumi 5-6, Hibarigaoka 3-chome, Nagata-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Anno, Toshihiko 46-2-202, Momoyama Mori Nagatonishi-machi Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Takada, Toshio 1, Nishisenouchi-cho, Kitashirakawa, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121586.9 | 18.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910340801 | 24.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34080191 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548841 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548841 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/10 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
H10N50/85 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1121 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12465 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Magnetowiderstandseffekt-Element | [1993/26] | English: | Magnetoresistance effect element | [1993/26] | French: | Elément à effet magnétorésistif | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP04048708 ; | [APD]EP0483373 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0506433 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |