EP0548868 - Method of refining of high purity steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-1-28 Kitahonmachi-Dori, 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-1-28 Kitahonmachi-Dori, 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshiei, c/o Tecnical Research Division Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasaki-cho Chuo-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | 02 /
Kirihara, Tadasu, c/o Tecnical Research Division Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasaki-cho Chuo-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | 03 /
Taguchi, Seiji, c/o Tecnical Research Division Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasaki-cho Chuo-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Tetsuya, c/o Tecnical Research Division Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasaki-cho Chuo-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | 05 /
Omiya, Shigeru, c/o Mizushima Works ofDivision Kawasaki Steel Corp., 1, Mizushima-Kawaski-dori Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712 / JP | 06 /
Suito, Masahito, c/o Mizushima Works ofDivision Kawasaki Steel Corp., 1, Mizushima-Kawaski-dori Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712 / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121682.6 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910340674 | 24.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34067491 | JP19920019065 | 04.02.1992 Original published format: JP 1906592 | JP19920031863 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3186392 | JP19920039454 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3945492 | JP19920094175 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9417592 | JP19920094176 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9417692 | JP19920153450 | 12.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15345092 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548868 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548868 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548868 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/10 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C21C7/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Raffinieren von sehr reinem Stahl | [1993/26] | English: | Method of refining of high purity steel | [1993/26] | French: | Procédé de raffinage d'acier très pur | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS63114918 ; | [AD]JPS5392320 ; | [AD]JPS589914 ; | [A]JPH01301814 ; | [A]DE3247757 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 3* page 13, line 11 - page 15, line 3 *; | [X]EP0351762 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0461415 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 2 * claim 1 *; | [E]EP0520085 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [E] 2 * claims 1,6 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880926), vol. 12, no. 358, Database accession no. (C - 531)<3205>, & JP63114918 A 19880519 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19781021), vol. 2, no. 126, Database accession no. (C - 25)<2582>, & JP53092320 A 19780814 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830330), vol. 7, no. 77, Database accession no. (C - 159)<1222>, & JP58009914 A 19830120 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900220), vol. 14, no. 90, Database accession no. (C - 691)<4033>, & JP01301814 A 19891206 (KAWASAKI STEEL) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - W.PLUSCHKELL, "Metallurgische Reaktionstechnik .....", STAHL UND EISEN, DUSSELDORF DE, (19900515), vol. 110, no. 5, pages 61 - 70 [A] 1 * page 63, column L * * page 67, column R * | [A] - N.N., "RH - Injection process .....", STEEL TIMES - INCORPORATING IRON & STEEL, LONDON GB, (198803), vol. 216, no. 3, page 143 [A] 1 |