EP0548881 - Antilock brake control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujioka, Hideaki, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121702.2 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910338400 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33840091 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548881 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548881 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548881 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/66, B60T8/64 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B60T8/1764 (EP,US);
Y10S303/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/26] | B60T8/64, B60T8/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | Blockierschutzregeleinrichtung | [1993/26] | English: | Antilock brake control apparatus | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de freinage anti-blocage | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3942683 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); | [A]DE4021993 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]WO9008681 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]EP0308795 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [AP]DE4020505 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) |