EP0550002 - Method of electrotinning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasa, Hiroki, c/o Patent and License Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | 02 /
Ichiba, Mikiyuki, c/o Patent and License Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Katsumi, c/o Patent and License Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Toyofumi, c/o Patent and License Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1 Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121830.1 | 22.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | JP19910360080 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: JP 36008091 | JP19910360081 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: JP 36008191 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550002 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550002 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/30, C25D21/14 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
C25D21/14 (EP);
C25D3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur galvanischen Verzinnung | [1993/27] | English: | Method of electrotinning | [1993/27] | French: | Procédé d'étamage électrolytique | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0268823 ; | [A]GB569447 |