EP0548986 - Process for producing phenol and methyl ethyl ketone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwanaga, Kiyoshi Kamiwasedaryo, 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken, 299-01 / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Mitsuhisa Sumitomo Shataku, 9, Yushudainishi-1-chome Ichihara-shi / JP | 03 /
Nakayama, Toshio 13-13, Kuranamidai-6-chome Sodegaura-shi / JP | 04 /
Usui, Masahiro 13-8, Nagauraekimae-4-chome Sodegaura-shi / JP | 05 /
Umida, Hiroyuki Yutokuryo, 29-7, Oike-2-chome Ibaraki-shi / JP | 06 /
Nagaoka, Hirooki Osenryo, 9-17, Sakuragaoka-4-chome Minoo-shi / JP | [1993/31] |
Former [1993/26] | 01 /
Iwanaga, Kiyoshi Kamiwasedaryo, 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Tamura, Mitsuhisa Sumitomo Shataku, 9, Yushudainishi-1-chome Ichihara-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Nakayama, Toshio 13-13, Kuranamidai-6-chome Sodegaura-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Usui, Masahiro 13-8, Nagauraekimae-4-chome Sodegaura-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Umida, Hiroyuki Yutokuryo, 29-7, Oike-2-chome Ibaraki-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Nagaoka, Hirooki Osenryo, 9-17, Sakuragaoka-4-chome Minoo-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121983.8 | 24.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910344976 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34497691 | JP19910344977 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34497791 | JP19920180768 | 08.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18076892 | JP19920186538 | 14.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18653892 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548986 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548986 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C409/08, C07C37/08, C07C39/04, C07C45/53, C07C49/10 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C07C409/08 (EP,US);
C07C39/04 (EP,US);
C07C407/00 (EP,US);
C07C407/003 (EP,US);
C07C45/53 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C407/003, C07C409/08 (US,EP);
C07C407/00, C07C409/08 (US,EP);
C07C45/53, C07C49/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phenol und Methylethylketon | [1993/26] | English: | Process for producing phenol and methyl ethyl ketone | [1993/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de phénol et de méthyléthylcétone | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2182802 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [AD]FR2183296 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 74975s, YAMAMOTO, MINORU ET AL 'Phenol, acetone, and methyl ethyl ketone from sec butylbenzene and cumene hydroperoxide.' page 638 ;column 1 ; |