EP0550052 - Lamp capsule support base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states GTE PRODUCTS CORPORATION 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Topel, A.Charles, Jr. 15 Hall St. Boston, MA 02130 / US | 02 /
Palmer III, Lewis H. 15 Abbot St. Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | 03 /
Leadvaro, Stephen J. 46 Lawrence St. Salem, MA 01970 / US | 04 /
Gagnon, Peter R. 75 Alderbrook Dr. Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | 05 /
Martin, Roy C. 24 Davis Terrace Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Butler, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1993/27] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | Application number, filing date | 92122083.6 | 28.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | US19910814856 | 30.12.1991 Original published format: US 814856 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550052 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550052 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550052 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/52, H01J9/30 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
H01J5/50 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US);
H01K1/34 (EP,US);
H01K1/42 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/27] | Title | German: | Lampenfuss | [1993/27] | English: | Lamp capsule support base | [1993/27] | French: | Pied de lampe | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.1997 | Decision despatched | 08.01.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 25.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4142122 (KOZA FRANCIS R) [A] 1,16 * column A * * column 1, line 36 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]US3250934 (PETERSON CARL L) [A] 1,16 * column 3, line 42 - line 55; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2838713 (MACKSOUD MICHEL E) [A] 1,16 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,2 * |