EP0550056 - Collection and transport vehicle for domestic waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOSYSTEM SARL 5, rue du 8 mai 1945 F-09600 Laroque D'Olmes / FR | [1993/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jean, Alain 4, rue de l'Abbaye F-82300 Moissac / FR | 02 /
Cailleaud, Jean-Pierre 5, rue du Languedoc F-31830 Plaisance du Touch / FR | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Schlawick, Yvan 8, rue Théophile Gautier 65000 Tarbes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Schlawick, Yvan 8, rue Théophile Gautier F-65000 Tarbes / FR | Application number, filing date | 92122093.5 | 29.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | FR19910016441 | 30.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9116441 | [1993/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550056 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/00 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
B65F3/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug zum Sammeln und Transportieren von Haushaltsmüll | [1993/27] | English: | Collection and transport vehicle for domestic waste | [1993/27] | French: | Véhicule de transport pour la collecte d'ordures ménagères | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/20] | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2594809 ; | [A]DE8811611U ; | [A]US4470747 |