EP0554573 - Pneumatic spring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPW Bergische Achsen Kommanditgesellschaft Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states BPW Bergische Achsen Kommanditgesellschaft Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | ||
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Helmut, Ing. Freiherr-v.-Stein-Strasse 1 W-5276 Wiehl / DE | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92122160.2 | 31.12.1992 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | DE19924203372 | 06.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4203372 | [1993/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554573 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554573 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554573 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/27 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
B60G11/28 (EP);
B62D61/12 (EP);
B60G2200/31 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
B60G2204/128 (EP);
B60G2206/601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/32] | Title | German: | Luftfeder | [1993/32] | English: | Pneumatic spring | [1993/32] | French: | Coussin d'air | [1993/32] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1025534 ; | [X]FR2201736 (GREGOIRE JEAN [FR]); | [X]US2917319 (AXTMANN HAROLD G); | [A]DK20406C (HOFMANN JOSEF [CH]); | [A]DK16702C (HOFMANN JOSEF [CH]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section PQ, Week 8414, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class Q, AN 84-087602 & SU-A-1 025 534 (BRYAN TRANSP MECH), & SU1025534 A 00000000 |