Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0495553 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1995 | B1 | EP0495553 | 22.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE119747T | 15.04.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69201647T | 05.10.1995 | T2 | DE69201647D1 | 20.04.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0495553T | 07.08.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2069370T | 01.05.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3015429T | 30.06.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5188858 | 23.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US64404291 | 18.01.1991 |