EP0495553 - Propylene glycol diesters of medium chain and long chain saturated fatty acids useful as reduced calorie cocoa butter substitutes and hard butters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stipp, Gordon Keith 8099 Chestershire Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 02 /
Kluesener, Bernard William 208 Circle Drive Harrison, Ohio 45030 / US | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 92200100.3 | 15.01.1992 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | US19910644042 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: US 644042 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495553 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495553 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, C11C3/08, A23L1/30 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
A23G1/38 (EP,US);
A23D9/013 (EP,US);
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
C07C69/28 (EP,US);
C11C3/08 (EP,US);
A23G2200/08 (EP,US);
Y10S426/804 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/30] | Title | German: | Propylenglycoldiester mittelkettiger und langkettiger gesättigter Fettsäuren, verwendbar als kalorienreduzierter Kakaobutter- und Hartbutter-Ersatz | [1992/30] | English: | Propylene glycol diesters of medium chain and long chain saturated fatty acids useful as reduced calorie cocoa butter substitutes and hard butters | [1992/30] | French: | Diesters de propylène glycol avec des acides gras saturés à chaîne moyenne et à chaîne longue, utilisables comme substituts réduits en calories du beurre de cacao et du beurre dur | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3809711 (YETTER J); | [AD]EP0390408 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [AD]EP0322027 |