EP0493378 - Use of 2',3'-dideoxyguanosine for the treatment of AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield Virginia 22161 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield, Virginia 22161 / US | ||
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE Washington, DC 20231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuya, Hiroaki 259 Congressional Lane T-2 Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | 02 /
Broder, Samuel 6004 Rossmore Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/27] | 01 /
Mitsuya, Hiroaki 259 Congressional Lane T-2 Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | ||
02 /
Border, Samuel 6004 Rossmore Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92200531.9 | 21.08.1986 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19850769016 | 26.08.1985 Original published format: US 769016 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493378 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K31/52 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 2',3'-Dideoxyguanosin zur Behandlung von AIDS | [1992/27] | English: | Use of 2',3'-dideoxyguanosine for the treatment of AIDS | [1992/27] | French: | Utilisation de la 2',3'-dideoxyguanosine pour le traitement du SIDA | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/32] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86306494.5 / EP0216510 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ED]EP0206497 | [XP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 83, March 1986, pages 1911-1915; H. MITSUYA et al: Inhibition of the in vitro infectivity and cytopathic effect of human T-lymphotrophic virus type III/lymphadenopathy-associated virus (HTLV-III/LAV) by 2',3'-dideoxynucleosides" | [YD] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 121, no. 2, 1984, pages 402-408, Alan R. Liss, Inc.; M.A. WAQAR et al.: Effects of 2',3'-dideoxynucleosides on mammalian cells and viruses" | [Y] - PHARM. RES., no. 1, 1984, pages 11-18; R.K. ROBINS: The potential of nucleotide analogs as inhibitors of Retroviruses and tumors" |