EP0506170 - Integrated structure of bipolar power device with high current density and fast diode and related manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | |||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno - CoRiMMe Stradale Primosole, 50 95100 Catania / IT | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | |||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | ||
For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frisina Ferruccio Via Martelli Castaldi, 120 I-95123 Catania / IT | 02 /
Ferla, Giuseppe Via Acicastello, 12 I-95126 Catania / IT | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92200748.9 | 17.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00836 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: IT MI910836 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506170 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506170 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/07, H01L21/22 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
H01L27/0761 (EP,US);
H01L21/221 (EP,US);
Y10S438/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/40] | Title | German: | Integrierte Struktur einer bipolaren Leistungsanordnung mit hoher Stromdichte und einer schnellen Diode und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/28] | English: | Integrated structure of bipolar power device with high current density and fast diode and related manufacturing process | [1992/40] | French: | Structure integrée comprenant un dispositif bipolaire de puissance à haute densité de courant et une diode rapide et son procédé de fabrication | [1992/40] |
Former [1992/40] | Integrierte Struktur einer bipolaren Leistungsanordnung mit hoher Stromdichte un einer schnellen Diode und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56114367 ; | [Y]DE1619972 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]US3645808 (KAMIYAMA TAKAMITSU, et al); | [A]DE3331631 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 192 (E-85)8 December 1981 & JP-A-56 114 367 ( TOSHIBA K.K. ) 8 September 1981, & JP56114367 A 19810908 |