EP0506178 - Power supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Laar, Henricus Johannes Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/40] | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92200760.4 | 17.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | EP19910200658 | 25.03.1991 Original published format: EP 91200658 | [1992/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0506178 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0506178 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506178 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46, G05F1/575, H01S3/133, H01S3/00, G05F1/66 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G05F1/569 (EP);
G05F1/565 (EP);
G05F1/575 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/40] | G05F1/46, G05F1/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/40] | Title | German: | Speisegerät | [1992/40] | English: | Power supply apparatus | [1992/40] | French: | Appareil d'alimentation | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60187074 ; | [A]DE3726243 ; | [A]US4019105 | [AD] - PHILIPS TECHNICAL REVIEW vol. 39, no. 2, 1980, EINDHOVEN, NL pages 37 - 47 J.C.J. FINCK ET AL. 'A Semiconductor Laser for Information Read-out' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 27 (E-378)(2084) 2 April 1986 & JP-A-60 187 074 ( TOSHIBA K.K. ) 24 September 1985, & JP60187074 A 19850924 |