EP0505002 - Method of preparing polyethercyclicpolyols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blytas, George Constantin 14323 Apple Tree Road Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 02 /
Zuzich, Anne Helene 13210 Old Richmond Road, no. 6 Houston, Texas 77083 / US | 03 /
Holloway, Eugene Leon 2135 Victoria Garden Drive Richmond, Texas 77469 / US | 04 /
Frank, Harry 13814 Queensbury Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [1992/39] | Application number, filing date | 92200766.1 | 17.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | US19910672200 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: US 672200 | US19910672199 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: US 672199 | US19910672198 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: US 672198 | US19910672203 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: US 672203 | US19910672202 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: US 672202 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505002 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505002 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/28, C08G65/34 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C08G65/34 (EP);
C08G65/22 (EP);
C09K8/34 (EP);
C09K8/528 (EP);
C09K2208/12 (EP);
C09K2208/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyethercyclopolyolen | [1992/39] | English: | Method of preparing polyethercyclicpolyols | [1992/39] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polyéthercyclopolyoles | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 31.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/14] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61238749 ; | [A]JP61043627 ; | [A]DE3346097 ; | [A]US3637774 ; | [A]DE3446720 ; | [A]US3968169 ; | [A]EP0333984 | [A] - DATABASE WPI Week 8649, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 86-322229 & JP-A-61 238 749 (NIPPON OILS & FATS KK), & JP61238749 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 203 (C-360)(2259) 16 July 1986 & JP-A-61 043 627 ( DAICEL CHEM IND LTD ), & JP61043627 A 19860716 |