EP0507402 - Process for preparing detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1992/41] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Euser, Huig, Unilever Research Laboratory Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Jackson, Philip Stephen, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral / GB | 03 /
Jeffreys, Amanda Jane, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral / GB | 04 /
Roberts, David William, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral / GB | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/16] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/25] | Agnew, Andrew, et al Unilever plc Patent Department Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/25] | Geary, Stephen Unilever Plc, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/41] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 92200908.9 | 30.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | GB19910007092 | 04.04.1991 Original published format: GB 9107092 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507402 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507402 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/04, C07C303/32 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
C11D1/66 (KR);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D11/04 (EP);
C11D17/065 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/22 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Waschmittelzusammensetzungen | [1992/41] | English: | Process for preparing detergent compositions | [1992/41] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des compositions détergentes | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
30.10.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Fiesser, Gerold Michael Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 26 02 32 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
30.10.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Fiesser, Gerold Michael Kahlhöfer Neumann Heilein Patentanwälte Postfach 26 02 32 80059 München / DE | |||
Former [2000/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
30.10.1999
15.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH R&T-Intellectual Properties Postfach 13 01 64 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1999/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 08.12.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.07.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.03.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/18] | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2003 | Appeal received No. T0236/03 | 11.02.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.02.1999 | LI | 03.02.1999 | NL | 03.02.1999 | SE | 03.02.1999 | GB | 30.03.2004 | DE | 01.10.2004 | FR | 30.11.2004 | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/45] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
GB | 30.03.2004 | ||
DE | 01.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
DE | 01.10.2004 | ||
Former [2003/07] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 10.05.1999 | |
LI | 10.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1047755 ; | [X]EP0364880 (SUNSTAR INC [JP], et al); | [A]DE2232341 (ORTHMANN & HERBST) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 238 (C-603)5 June 1989 & JP-A-1 047 755 ( DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD ) 22 February 1989, & JP1047755 A 19890222 | Examination | JPS6447755 |